FANCONI HOPE

Charity number: 1126894
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £20,058 £19,138 £31,948 £10,004 £91,777
Total expenditure £7,890 £37,242 £24,004 £41,696 £15,602