STONY STRATFORD COMMUNITY CHURCH, (MEMBER OF THE BAPTIST UNION)

Charity number: 1131785
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £275,067 £250,373 £315,215 £291,029 £260,723
Total expenditure £270,564 £153,263 £601,817 £243,711 £194,200