THE DAVID GIBBONS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1134727
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £121.17k £126.51k £127.79k £132.15k £134.34k
Total expenditure £120.42k £130.70k £136.88k £131.03k £139.99k