PENZANCE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1134242
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £80,525 £68,122 £92,914 £65,987 £62,599
Total expenditure £66,114 £60,917 £108,248 £82,698 £66,677