THREE TREES COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1140924
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Other income £192,606 £241,620 £462,192 £308,002 £102,217
Total expenditure £113,411 £288,972 £389,296 £355,590 £82,642