FOR LIFE TRUST

Charity number: 1143950
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £181,657 £94,681 £111,750 £81,742 £102,359
Total expenditure £176,764 £98,107 £111,317 £78,596 £109,410