THE KACHIN RELIEF FUND

Charity number: 1148586
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £28,041 £30,810 £28,258 £32,975 £29,291
Total expenditure £30,031 £28,240 £25,892 £39,247 £23,097