THE BETTY MESSENGER CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1149282
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £1,177,056 £788,476 £556,684 £309,834 £668,991
Total expenditure £1,292,675 £1,270,792 £577,118 £376,268 £2,161,902