BLIND DOG RESCUE UK

Charity number: 1148828
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £43,493 £55,074 £91,174 £79,753 £59,542
Total expenditure £40,611 £59,131 £80,908 £83,220 £61,935