BRASS FOR AFRICA

Charity number: 1149863
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £156,245 £239,258 £209,944 £308,219 £389,538
Total expenditure £160,910 £210,245 £195,054 £267,456 £426,109