NILE SWIMMERS

Charity number: 1152395
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Other income £17,088 £17,932 £27,115 £18,534 £7,652
Total expenditure £1,517 £23,603 £31,593 £3,166 £11,578