UZIMA IN OUR HANDS

Charity number: 1153181
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £37,915 £31,040 £66,526 £70,825 £93,952
Total expenditure £44,675 £30,539 £63,029 £68,444 £101,568