OAKHALL CHURCH, CATERHAM

Charity number: 1156069
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £440,614 £714,970 £550,469 £3,992,308 £3,143,777
Total expenditure £275,157 £359,549 £446,604 £445,237 £362,936