THE NOOR FOUNDATION UK

Charity number: 1155934
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £0 £0 £140,046 £108,509 £82,123
Total expenditure £0 £0 £113,259 £162,421 £79,611