OCEANS PROJECT

Charity number: 1156583
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Other income £17,211 £8,010 £1,950 £96 £72
Total expenditure £20,342 £7,694 £1,963 £0 £161