PANAVIA TORNADO PRESERVATION GROUP

Charity number: 1163207
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £1,217 £502 £1,295 £3,487 £2,351
Total expenditure £0 £178 £272 £5,043 £1,486