VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 520520
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £14,313 £15,550 £21,340 £18,971 £17,192
Total expenditure £2,957 £15,322 £24,093 £17,951 £20,575