STARMAKER THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 801294
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Other income £147,396 £154,189 £154,797 £150,792 £128,411
Total expenditure £155,820 £146,899 £150,502 £150,200 £144,022