Family Fund Trust

Charity number: 1053866
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 MAR 1996 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30 MAY 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 JAN 2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 FEB 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 MAR 2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 APR 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 SEP 2018 as amended on 12 Aug 2019 as amended on 09 Sep 2019

Charitable objects

The Charity's objects ("the Objects") are (1) primarily to assist families, parents and others with parental responsibility in the United Kingdom caring for a severely disabled child or person, and (2) the relief of those in need by reason of disability, ill health, financial hardship or other disadvantage by: (i) providing support by way of financial grants, goods, services and information; (ii) furthering knowledge about disability and its impact on the disabled child or person, their siblings, parents or carers; and (iii) working with other charitable organisations to deliver financial grants, goods, services and information to those in need by reason of disability, ill health, financial hardship or other disadvantage.

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

UNITED KINGDOM