WORLD OBESITY FEDERATION

Charity number: 1076981
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/07/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/08/2002 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 MAY 2016 as amended on 07 Jul 2020 as amended on 07 Jul 2020

Charitable objects

FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH BY DEVELOPING A DEEPER UNDERSTANDING OF THE CAUSES OF OBESITY AND ITS PREVENTION AND MANAGEMENT BY HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS, HEALTH RELATED ORGANISATIONS, GOVERNMENTS AND THE INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITY.

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

NOT DEFINED