THE ROYAL FOUNDATION OF THE DUKE AND DUCHESS OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1132048
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 JUN 2018 as amended on 06 Sep 2019 as amended on 08 Aug 2019

Charitable objects

THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.