RAILWAY BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION

Charity number: 206312
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 29/12/1949, RULES AND BYE LAWS ADOPTED 28/5/1951, PURSUANT TO ARTICLE 15 OF ROYAL CHARTER, AMENDMENTS APPROVED BY ORDER OF COUNCIL DATED 13/8/1965 AND 27/10/1993 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 28TH MARCH 1994 AS AMENDED ON 01 MAR 2018

Charitable objects

TO RELIEVE AGED OR DISABLED OR NECESSITOUS RAILWAYMEN, THEIR SPOUSES OR CHILDREN, OR OTHER RELATIVES OR PERSONS WHO WERE IMMEDIATELY AND WHOLLY OR PARTLY DEPENDENT UPON THEM.

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

NATIONAL