GINGERBREAD, THE CHARITY FOR SINGLE PARENT FAMILIES

Charity number: 230750
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/01/1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/01/1971 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/06/1973 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06/07/1973 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/11/1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/08/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/07/2013

Charitable objects

TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY AND DISADVANTAGE AND TO PROMOTE FAIR AND EQUAL TREATMENT AND OPPORTUNITY AMONG SINGLE PARENTS AND THEIR CHILDREN, AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THEIR WELL-BEING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND OTHER SERVICES: THE CONDUCTING, COMMISSIONING AND PUBLICATION OF RESEARCH: AND THE RAISING OF AWARENESS THROUGH PUBLICATIONS, USE OF THE MEDIA, PUBLIC ADVOCACY AND OTHER MEANS OF COMMUNICATION. FOR THESE PURPOSES A SINGLE PARENT MEANS AN ADULT WHO IS THE MAIN CARER FOR ONE OR MORE DEPENDENT CHILDREN WITHOUT A PARTNER IN THE SAME HOUSEHOLD.

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

NOT DEFINED