ST. BARNABAS HOSPICES (SUSSEX) LTD

Charity number: 256789
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/04/1968 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/11/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/02/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/05/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 FEB 2016

Charitable objects

THE HELP AND RELIEF OF PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM CANCER AND OTHER TERMINAL CONDITIONS.

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

NOT DEFINED