SOUTHAMPTON MUSICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 299426
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

CONSTITUTION ADOPTED APRIL 1985 AS AMENDED 17TH MAY 1988 AND 22ND AUG 1990, 21 MAY 1992, 13 MAY 1993, 27 APRIL 1995 AND 20 NOVEMBER 1997. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 05 APR 2016 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18 DEC 2018

Charitable objects

TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS; TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS; TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARIABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

SOUTHAMPTON