UNIVERSITIES & COLLEGES CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 306137
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 JUNE 1944 AS AMENDED 13 JUNE 1950, 8TH MAY 1986, 5 FEBRUARY 1987 AND 12 OCTOBER 1999, 29/09/2004

Charitable objects

TO ADVANCE THE EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN FAITH AMONG STUDENTS IN UNIVERSITIES, THEOLOGICAL COLLEGES, TRAINING COLLEGES, TECHNICAL COLLEGES AND OTHER SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS IN GREAT BRITAIN AND IN ALL OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD PROVIDED THAT THE PHRASE "EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN FAITH" SHALL BE INTERPRETED TO MEAN THE FUNDAMENTAL TRUTHS OF CHRISTIANITY, AS REVEALED IN HOLY SCRIPTURE (SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION FOR FURTHER DETAILS).

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS