Governing document WALCOT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 6TH FEBRUARY 1991, ORDER DATED 24TH AUGUST 2004 AND AMENDMENT MADE 5 OCTOBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 26 MARCH 2007 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 14/10/2015
Charitable objects
THE INCOME SHALL BE USED FOR THE PURPOSES OF REBUILDING AND IMPROVING THE PROPERTY OF THE FOUNDATION, MAINTENANCE OF THE SCHOOL PREMISES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL BENEFITS (SEE SCHEME DATED 6 FEBRUARY 1991 FOR FULL DETAILS).
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF LAMBETH.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.