DAISIE RICH TRUST

Charity number: 236706
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

EXTRACT FROM WILL (CLAUSES 10(E) AND 11) MADE 30/4/1954 AND PROVED AT WINCHESTER ON 29/11/1955 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 14/07/2004 AS AMENDED 07/10/2004 AS AMENDED ON 17/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18 OCT 2016

Charitable objects

A) THE GRANTING OF ANNUITIES OR ALLOWANCES TO SUCH OF THE PERSONS FOLLOWING AS ARE OR SHALL BE NECESSITOUS AND DESERVING NAMELY PERSONS WHO ARE FOR THE TIME BEING OR WHO HAVE BEEN IN THE EMPLOYMENT OF UPWARD & RICH LIMITED AND THE WIFE WIDOW HUSBAND WIDOWER CHILDREN PARENTS OR OTHER DEPENDANTS AND IF FOR ANY REASON WHATSOEVER THE TRUSTS AFORESAID SHALL FAIL OR DETERMINE THEN OR WHERE SURPLUS FUNDS REMAIN AFTER THE PURPOSES SET OUT IN THIS SUB-CLAUSE HAVE BEEN AS FAR AS MAY BE FULFILLED. B) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE TRUSTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

NEWPORT (ISLE OF WIGHT)