INTERNATIONAL SEAFARERS' WELFARE AND ASSISTANCE NETWORK

Charity number: 1102946
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/05/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/05/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/03/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/12/2012 as amended on 18 Nov 2019

Charitable objects

(1) TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AMONGST SEAFARERS OF ALL NATIONALITIES, RACES, COLOURS AND CREEDS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS. (2) TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH AND SAFETY OF ALL SEAFARERS AND THE RELIEF OF SICK, ILL AND DISABLED SEAFARERS. (3) TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES AT SEA OR SERVING INTERNATIONAL PORTS FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR ALL SEAFARERS WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE AFRICA, THE AMERICAS, ASIA EUROPE AND OCEANIA.