THE BOOTH CENTRE

Charity number: 1062674
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 APR 1997 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 04 FEB 2008 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 30 MAY 2017 as amended on 27 Feb 2018 as amended on 29 May 2018

Charitable objects

(1) THE RELIEF OF HOMELESS PERSONS AND OTHERS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

MANCHESTER AND SALFORD