COMPASSION UK CHRISTIAN CHILD DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1077216
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/02/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/07/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/08/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/09/1999 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24/10/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/07/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/07/2014

Charitable objects

(1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ALL OR ANY PART OF THE WORLD (2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SUFFERING OR DISTRESS AMONGST CHILDREN (INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY THE PREVENTION OF MALNUTRITION, ILLNESS AND DISEASE) (3) THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHILDREN (4) THE DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN TO SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL MATURITY NOTHING IN THESE ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

WORLDWIDE.