KRISHNAMURTI FOUNDATION TRUST LTD

Charity number: 312865
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/05/1972 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/03/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/11/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/11/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/03/2013

Charitable objects

TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PHILOSOPHY, SOCIOLOGY, PSYCHOLOGY AND COMPARATIVE RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF THE TEACHINGS IN THOSE FIELDS OF JIDDU KRISHNAMURTI.

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

NOT DEFINED