THE ELIZABETH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 293835
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/11/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/02/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/07/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/06/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 SEP 2016

Charitable objects

THE RELIEF OF DEAF AND HARD OF HEARING CHILDREN AND ADULTS BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND ASSISTANCE TO THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND BY THE PROMOTION OF THE EARLY DETECTION OF DEAFNESS AND HEARING LOSS IN BABIES AND YOUNG CHILDREN, AND THE PROMOTION OF HIGH QUALITY AUDIOLOGICAL CARE AND SUPPORT FOR ALL.

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

NOT DEFINED