DARTMOUTH UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 203399
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

SCHEMES OF 20 JULY 1987 AND 11 AUGUST 1998, AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 24 FEBRUARY 2003 AND BY A RESOLUTION DATED 3 AUGUST 2005. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19 JUL 2017 as amended on 02 Jul 2019

Charitable objects

1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS IN THE ALMSHOUSES OF THE CHARITY. 2) RELIEF IN NEED FOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

PARISH OF DARTMOUTH