THE INSTITUTE OF MARINE ENGINEERING, SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY

Charity number: 212992
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

ROYAL CHARTER OF 19TH APRIL 1933 AND SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS OF 30TH AUGUST 1954, 5TH MARCH 1956, 23RD JULY 1958, 23RD MAY 1973 AND 23RD OCTOBER 1989. ORDER IN COUNCIL OF JULY 18TH 2001.

Charitable objects

TO PROMOTE THE SCIENTIFIC DEVELOPMENT OF MARINE ENGINEERING IN ALL ITS BRANCHES.

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

NOT DEFINED