Governing document INTERNATIONAL BIBLE STUDENTS ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/06/1914 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/11/1949 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/04/1951 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/01/1958 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/11/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 APR 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE CHRISTIAN KNOWLEDGE BY THE DISSEMINATION OF BIBLE TRUTHS, ORALLY AND BY THE PRINTED PAGE, AND BY MEANS OF THE DISTRIBUTION OF BIBLES AND THE PRINTING AND PUBLICATION OF BIBLE STUDY HELPS, TRACTS, PAMPHLETS, PAPERS AND OTHER RELIGIOUS DOCUMENTS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.