BFBS

Charity number: 233480
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29TH MARCH 1946 AS AMENDED 1ST JANUARY 1969, 25TH JULY 1978, 27TH MARCH 1979, 13TH MAY 1982, 11 DECEMBER 1998 AND 24TH JUNE 2008 as amended on 23 Jul 2020

Charitable objects

THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CORPORATION IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF MEMBERS OF HER MAJESTY'S ARMED FORCES (WHICH EXPRESSION SHALL, FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS MEMORANDUM BE DEEMED TO INCLUDE MEMBERS OF ANY NURSING OR OTHER AUXILIARY SERVICE OF HER MAJESTY'S SAID FORCES AND MEMBERS OF ANY CADET FORCE, TRAINING CORPS OR OTHER BODY HAVING AS AN OBJECT THEREOF THE TRAINING OF PERSONS FOR MEMBERSHIP OF HER MAJESTY'S SAID FORCES OR ANY NURSING OR AUXILIARY SERVICE THEREOF) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, WELFARE, TRAINING AND ENTERTAINMENT.

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

NOT DEFINED