THE MOST VENERABLE ORDER OF THE HOSPITAL OF ST JOHN OF JERUSALEM (THE ORDER OF ST JOHN)

Charity number: 235979
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

ROYAL CHARTER, 1955 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 6TH MARCH 1974 AND STATUTES AS AMENDED ON 9TH FEBRUARY 1993, 2ND NOVEMBER 1994, 23RD NOVEMBER 1995 AND 21ST JULY 1999 AND 17 DECEMBER 2002 (BUT NOT TAKING EFFECT UNTIL 1 JANUARY 2004) as amended by an Order in Council on 25 May 2018

Charitable objects

TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE ALL WORKS OF HUMANITY AND CHARITY FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN SICKNESS, DISTRESS, SUFFERING OR DANGER, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE, CLASS OR CREED.

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

NOT DEFINED