CANTERBURY THEATRE AND FESTIVAL TRUST

Charity number: 279714
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 FEBRUARY 1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 JANUARY 1983, 9 MARCH 1990, 8 JUNE 1994, 27 NOVEMBER 2007 AND 28 APRIL 2008.

Charitable objects

TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PERFORMING AND VISUAL ARTS, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE INVOLVEMENT AND PARTICIPATION OF THE PUBLIC THEREIN;PROVIDED THAT ALL THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST SHALL BE OF A CHARITABLE NATURE AND THAT THEIR PROMOTION SHALL BE OF PUBLIC BENEFIT

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

CANTERBURY