MIDLANDS AIR AMBULANCE CHARITY

Charity number: 1143118
Charity reporting is up to date
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 05/03/1997 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25/07/2012
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING SICKNESS BY THE OPERATION OF A HELICOPTER EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICE WITHIN THE WEST MIDLANDS, SHROPSHIRE, STAFFORDSHIRE, WARWICKSHIRE HEREFORD AND WORCESTER, GLOUCESTERSHIRE, POWYS AND SUCH ADJACENT AREAS AS MAY BE EFFECTIVELY SERVED BY THE OPERATION OF ONE OR MORE HELICOPTER AMBULANCES
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Registration history
  • 06 December 1990 : registered
  • 12 September 1997 : removed
  • 10 December 1997 : registered