THE CLOTHWORKERS' FOUNDATION

Charity number: 274100
Charity reporting is up to date
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS 05/12/1919 CONFIRMED BY HOLLIGRAVE CHARITY SCHEME CONFIRMATION ACT 1916, AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 21/10/1969,31/12/1980,19/05/1989 & 9/03/2004 (NOTE:UNITING DIRECTION (MADE UNDER S96(5) OF THE CHARITIES ACT)(SEE FILE)
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE CLOTHWORKERS' FOUNDATION SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Registration history
  • 12 July 2004 : registered