Family Fund Trust

Charity number: 1053866
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John GRANT Macrae Trustee 20 March 2015 None on record
TARA MARIE PALMER Trustee 11 September 2015 None on record
GEOFFREY CYRIL LINNELL Trustee 06 March 2015 None on record
Kate Fleck Trustee 12 December 2017 None on record
DAVID LEWIS Trustee 02 July 2013 None on record
Jonathan Trevor Evans Trustee 22 March 2019 None on record
Neil Robert Scott Chair 11 September 2015 None on record
David Michael Braybrook Trustee 06 March 2015 None on record
Gareth Peter Lambert Trustee 22 March 2019 None on record
MARY ANN BISHOP Trustee 01 August 2017
CHRISTIAN BLIND MISSION (UNITED KINGDOM) LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
Andrew Robert Piper Trustee 22 March 2019 None on record