THE KINDU TRUST

Charity number: 1069574
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jack Leonard Sharville Trustee 08 October 2014
LINK ETHIOPIA Charity reporting is up to date
Together We Learn Charity reporting is up to date
Holly McKenzie Trustee 10 October 2018 None on record
ASHLEY ENGLAND Trustee 09 September 2015
LINK ETHIOPIA Charity reporting is up to date
Together We Learn Charity reporting is up to date
ELIZABETH GEZAHEGN KING Trustee 09 March 2017
LINK ETHIOPIA Charity reporting is up to date
Together We Learn Charity reporting is up to date
MRS MARIA GABRIELLA OTTY Trustee 09 September 2015
LINK ETHIOPIA Charity reporting is up to date
Together We Learn Charity reporting is up to date
Matthew David Stockdale Trustee 03 October 2018 None on record