OPTIMUM POPULATION TRUST

Charity number: 1114109
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
FIONA JANINE MCKENZIE Trustee 17 February 2015 None on record
Sara Lamb Parkin Chair 18 June 2019 None on record
Christopher Padley Trustee 30 November 2019 None on record
PROFESSOR STEPHEN BOWN Trustee None on record
John Edward Davies Trustee 10 October 2015 None on record
Philippa Ann Hayes Trustee 06 October 2018 None on record
Anna Victoria Hughes Trustee 17 November 2018 None on record
ASCANIO VITALE Trustee 10 October 2015 None on record
MARGARET AVISON Trustee 19 October 2011 None on record
Emma Danielle Olliff Trustee 21 October 2017 None on record
HARRY CRIPPS Trustee None on record
Dr Rebecca Jane Foljambe Trustee 30 November 2019 None on record