CROSSROADS IN HERTFORDSHIRE (NORTH AND NORTHEAST) CARING FOR CARERS

Charity number: 1121629
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jeremy Colman Trustee 30 July 2019 None on record
Fraser Hill Trustee 15 September 2015 None on record
ROBERT FEE Trustee 14 July 2015 None on record
Chris Wraith Trustee 28 March 2019 None on record
VIVIEN JANE KERR Trustee 09 June 2014 None on record
Justin Jewitt Trustee 09 June 2014 None on record
PETER DUFFY Trustee 14 July 2015 None on record
Graham Horne Trustee 29 November 2018 None on record