THE ROYAL FOUNDATION OF THE DUKE AND DUCHESS OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1132048
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alice Webb Trustee 17 June 2020 None on record
Lady Demetra Aikaterini Pinsent Trustee 07 December 2016 None on record
Lord Hague of Richmond William Hague Trustee 17 June 2020 None on record
CHARLES STUART MINDENHALL Trustee 14 May 2015
BARKING & DAGENHAM YOUTH ZONE Charity reporting is up to date
MENTAL HEALTH INNOVATIONS Charity reporting is up to date
THE CHALCOT FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
ONSIDE YOUTH ZONES Charity reporting is up to date
Claire Jessica Wills Trustee 27 June 2018 None on record
Simon Iain Patterson Trustee 07 December 2016 None on record
Zeinab Mohammed-Khair Badawi-Malik Trustee 23 September 2020
BBC MEDIA ACTION Charity reporting is up to date
MARY KINGSLEY ZOCHONIS LECTURE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
THE ROYAL AFRICAN SOCIETY Charity reporting is up to date
Hannah Cockburn-Logie OBE MVO Trustee 08 June 2020 None on record
SIR KEITH EDWARD MILLS GBE DL Trustee 14 May 2015 None on record