THE MAYOR OF LONDON'S FUND FOR YOUNG MUSICIANS

Charity number: 1141216
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katya Gorbatiouk Trustee 07 July 2020 None on record
Yung Yung Lee Trustee 07 July 2020 None on record
Michael Berry Trustee 30 March 2012 None on record
Kevin Leslie Gardiner Trustee 27 February 2019 None on record
David Kershaw Trustee 12 July 2016 None on record
Mark Alexander George Wade Trustee 27 February 2019 None on record
Oonagh Barry Trustee 25 March 2015 None on record
Veronica Wadley CBE Chair 06 April 2011
YEHUDI MENUHIN SCHOOL LIMITED On time
Sally Anne Greene OBE Trustee 06 March 2018 None on record
Marianne Christiane Scordel Trustee 06 March 2018 None on record
Richard Morris Trustee 06 April 2011 None on record
Chinyere Adah Nwanoku MBE Trustee 12 July 2016
THE TERTIS FOUNDATION On time
Emma Chamberlain OBE Trustee 23 May 2018 None on record
Oliver Duff Trustee 21 April 2016 None on record
Patrick Gregory Birch Harrison LVO Trustee 04 February 2020 None on record