TEACHER DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1147447
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dame Susan Elizabeth John Chair 18 September 2019 None on record
MARTIN POST Trustee 13 November 2018 None on record
Anna Pedroza Trustee 03 January 2018 None on record
Andrea Carr Trustee 09 July 2019
CAUSEWAY EDUCATION LTD On time
Samuel James Freedman Trustee 03 January 2018 None on record
VEENA NAIDOO Trustee 10 July 2018 None on record