ASSOCIATION FOR LEARNING TECHNOLOGY

Charity number: 1160039
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Charles Trustee 06 September 2017 None on record
Peter Bryant Trustee 06 September 2017 None on record
David White Trustee 25 June 2020 None on record
Bella Abrams Trustee 01 February 2016 None on record
Helen O'Sullivan Chair 24 June 2020 None on record
Keith Smyth Trustee 04 September 2019 None on record
Daniel Clark Trustee 09 September 2015 None on record
Sharon Flynn Trustee 04 September 2019 None on record
Natalie Lafferty Trustee 04 September 2019 None on record
Lorna Campbell Trustee 07 September 2016 None on record