RAILWAY BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION

Charity number: 206312
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane English Trustee 08 August 2012
THE BIG TRUST LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
LANGTON HOME FUND Charity reporting is 27 days late
Janet Goodland Trustee 09 October 2013
LANGTON HOME FUND Charity reporting is 27 days late
Paula Hayes Trustee 26 June 2016
LANGTON HOME FUND Charity reporting is 27 days late
Newton Mark Trustee 29 November 2017 None on record
Tim Shoveller Chair 05 July 2014 None on record
CYRIL FRANCIS JOHNSON Trustee 14 June 2015
LANGTON HOME FUND Charity reporting is 27 days late
Margaret Joyce SIMPSON Trustee 29 November 2017 None on record
Mark ENRIGHT Trustee 25 June 2017 None on record
Ciaran Barr Trustee 29 November 2017 None on record
Kevin Adlam Trustee 24 February 2020 None on record
Ian JEFFREY Trustee 01 March 2018 None on record
JOHN KENNEDY Trustee 20 June 2016 None on record
Samantha Turner Trustee 26 September 2019 None on record